THE FRIENDS OF HAM HILL

Charity number: 1177431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promote the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment of Ham Hill Country Park. Support educational activities at Ham Hill Country Park.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,166
Total expenditure: £3,734

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 March 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEVEN POOLMAN Chair 06 September 2017
None on record
Nichola Holroyd Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
David Alastair McCulley Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
Jaine Leaning Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Neil Dutton Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
JENNIFER FOX Trustee 06 September 2017
None on record
JOHN DAY Trustee 06 September 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.78k £1.87k £4.66k £13.94k £1.17k
Total expenditure £8.87k £1.46k £1.93k £3.50k £3.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
49 CASTLE STREET
STOKE-SUB-HAMDON
TA14 6RF
Phone:
01935823274
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available