BRASS...

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Debt and budgeting help at home
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER JAMES DYSON | Chair | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Sparrow | Trustee | 02 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Inga Arlauskiene | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Anne Montgomerie | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW NAPIER DYSON | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE DYSON | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/01/2020 | 29/01/2021 | 29/01/2022 | 29/01/2023 | 29/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £11.85k | £0 | £9.80k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £777 | £4.47k | £4.69k | £8.45k | £10.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 January 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 January 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 January 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 January 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL GUIDANCE AND BUDGETING SKILLS TO LOW INCOME FAMILIES/INDIVIDUALS IN THEIR OWN HOMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 WHITECROSS GARDENS
YORK
YO31 8JH
- Phone:
- 01904673175
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window