AD INFINITUM PRODUCTIONS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the arts for the public benefit by the promotion in particular, but not exclusively, of the art of drama.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £231,950 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 August 2019: CIO registration
- AD INFINITUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
L CLANCY | Chair | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Larna Bernard | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Xiaoxing Dong | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donna Louise Williams | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Royston Gardner | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE CLARE ARAM | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £87.47k | £278.59k | £288.99k | £379.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £273.63k | £287.75k | £381.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.67k | £180.44k | £148.21k | £231.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Aug 2019 as amended on 23 Mar 2022 as amended on 13 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
To advance the arts for the public benefit, and to provide professional development, education and training, through the promotion in particular, but not exclusively, of the art of drama in the UK and overseas.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Oakfield Road
Bristol
BS8 2AP
- Phone:
- 07438 782515
- Email:
- admin@ad-infinitum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window