Financial history FRIENDS FOR FAMILIES (SEVENOAKS)

Charity number: 1178499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £75.41k £105.38k £116.28k £193.93k £139.70k
Total expenditure £54.85k £84.27k £114.65k £124.78k £111.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £5.00k £2.50k N/A