NORTH CORNWALL RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the group is to promote the objects of the Riding for the Disabled Association . Operating from Lakefield Equestrian Center we provide disabled people with the opportunity to ride to benefit their health and well being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 26 February 2018: CIO registration
- 04 November 2019: Funds received from 1074201 NORTH CORNWALL GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOC...
- NCRDA (Working name)
- NORTH CORNWALL RDA GROUP (Working name)
- NORTH CORNWALL GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark David Cunliffe | Chair | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Rickard | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Hicks | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Furber | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELISABETH CUNLIFFE | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MARION LARKIN | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||
KIM NICOLA BUTLER | Trustee | 01 November 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £15.43k | £6.35k | £23.10k | £64.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £16.80k | £20.12k | £19.20k | £37.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 16 July 2020 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE NORTH CORNWALL AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lakefield Equestrian Centre
Lower Pendavey Farm
CAMELFORD
Cornwall
PL32 9TX
- Phone:
- 07717727147
- Email:
- northcornwallrda@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window