THE HOINES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal aim of the Trust is to help alleviate extreme poverty with particular emphasis on access to education and healthcare for those living in developing countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 February 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE-MARIE HOINES | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAY HOINES | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/01/2020 | 08/01/2021 | 08/01/2022 | 08/01/2023 | 08/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £668.42k | £627.77k | £257.89k | £326.91k | £147.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £693.72k | £739.85k | £273.86k | £247.00k | £221.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £177.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £422.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £38.97k | £27.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £50.67k | £739.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.92k | £19.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £34.75k | £14.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £643.04k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 January 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 January 2023 | 15 November 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2023 | 15 November 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 January 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 January 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 January 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE HOINES CHARITABLE TRUST FUND TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OGLETHORPE STURTON & GILLIBRAND
16 CASTLE PARK
LANCASTER
LA1 1YG
- Phone:
- 01524846846
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window