AJMER SHARIF DARGAH (INDIA)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To propagate the faith,life,times & Sufi Healing of Hazrat Khwaja Gharib Nawaz (R.A). Also to assist in Humanity and Charitable Causes & Sufi Spiritual Healing to those who seek such assistance through or at Ajmer Sharif Dargah In India. The Charity works closely with the Descendants of Khwaja Moinuddin Hassan Chishty (R.A). It is these descendants that are Gaddi Nashin and Chief Moallim.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.36k | £10.59k | £24.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.22k | £11.97k | £20.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 20 December 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BASED AROUND THE AJMER SHARIF DARGAH IN AJMER, RAJASTHAN, INDIA, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY COORDINATING AND DEVELOPING SERVICES SUCH AS, THE PROVISION OF BEDDING, CLOTHING, FOOD, FINANCE AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES FOR THOSE IN NEED AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window