Accounts and annual returns BACKBARROW IRONWORKS HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1177622
Charity reporting is overdue by 121 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 121 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 121 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 21 November 2024 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 21 November 2024 329 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 06 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 14 January 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 14 January 2021 16 days late Download Open in new window