GLOBAL HEALTH FILM INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity benefits the public by increasing awareness about global health to inspire change and thereby improve the standards of global health worldwide. It organises an annual Global Health Film Festival, documentary screenings related to global health and runs workshops relating to global health and film making.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 September 2018: Standard registration
- GHFI (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LALITHA BHAGAVATHEESWARAN | Chair | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mike Rub | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER HUGO JARRETT | Trustee | 19 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE RANSLEY | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £285.83k | £156.54k | £49.39k | £76.01k | £80.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.20k | £140.83k | £49.14k | £75.92k | £80.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO: 2.1 ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE AND GLOBAL HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY DISTRIBUTING OR ASSISTING IN THE DISTRIBUTION OF MATERIAL, VIA FILM, MEDIA AND WORKSHOPS, WHICH INCREASES THE GENERAL AND SPECIALIST KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE SUBJECT OF HEALTH CARE AND GLOBAL HEALTH, AND BY SUPPORTING AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS IN THE USE OF FILM AND OTHER MEDIA TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT HEALTH CARE AND GLOBAL HEALTH; AND 2.2 PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE AROUND THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY DISTRIBUTING OR ASSISTING IN THE DISTRIBUTION OF MATERIAL, VIA FILM, MEDIA AND WORKSHOPS, WHICH INCREASES THE GENERAL AND SPECIALIST KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF HEALTH AND GLOBAL HEALTH ISSUES INCLUDING POSSIBLE SOLUTIONS, AND BY SUPPORTING AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS IN THE USE OF FILM AND OTHER MEDIA TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT HEALTH AND GLOBAL HEALTH ISSUES INCLUDING POSSIBLE SOLUTIONS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS, “GLOBAL HEALTH” IS A RECOGNISED MULTI-DISCIPLINARY SUBJECT OF STUDY, RESEARCH AND PRACTICE (WITHIN AND BEYOND THE SCIENCES) COVERING TRANSNATIONAL HEALTH ISSUES, DETERMINANTS AND SOLUTIONS IN THE CONTEXT OF BOTH POPULATION-BASED PREVENTION AND INDIVIDUAL-LEVEL CARE, WITH A FOCUS ON IMPROVING HEALTH FOR ALL PEOPLE WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bates Wells Braithwaite
Thames Exchange
10 Queen Street Place
London
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- 07885850088
- Email:
- info@globalhealthfilm.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window