THE JAMES BURKE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the physical and mental health of sufferers of mental health problems, throughout England, through the provision of support, education, practical advice and support to relevant projects. To advance the education of the general public in all areas relating to mental health problems.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL RADCLIFFE | Chair | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Abraham | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
GINA GREENLEY | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
ANN PRESTON | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
WARREN SMITH | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
BRIDGET PEARSON | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
ADAM FORBER | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SONNY NICKLE | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Cllr Sharon Burke | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.50k | £6.08k | £3.24k | £452 | £8.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50 | £3.86k | £6.68k | £6.23k | £5.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 December 2024 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 December 2024 | 1034 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 4 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, THROUGHOUT ENGLAND, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND GRANTS TO RELEVANT PROJECTS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 OLD RUN ROAD
LEEDS
LEEDS
93 Old Run Road
LEEDS
LS10 3AZ
- Phone:
- 07967193956
- Website:
-
under construction
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window