ST JOHN VILLAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide and maintain the St John Village Hall and field for the use of the inhabitants of the village and parish of St. John, Torpoint, Cornwall for the benefit without distinction of political religious or other opinions incl. the use for lectures, classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 24 May 2018: CIO registration
- THE ST JOHN VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- THE ST JOHN RECREATION CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD MAXWELL DOLTON | Chair | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Taylor | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Clarke | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charles Burton | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Judith Lesley Annells | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Barrie Mills | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHARMAINE MARY FERGUSON | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTIAN BARR FERRIS | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.04k | £46.99k | £126.77k | £13.56k | £8.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.39k | £33.60k | £147.34k | £14.59k | £6.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.63k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN THE ST. JOHN VILLAGE HALL AND FIELD FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE AND PARISH OF ST JOHN, TORPOINT IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL FOR THE BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING THE USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glenside
St. John
TORPOINT
Cornwall
PL11 3AR
- Phone:
- 01752823119
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window