CHILD ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Child Action Group CAG supports and speaks out for Colombians most vulnerable and neglected children and young people Aiming to provide for them a decent starting life and brighter future CAG delivers and fund projects aimed at providing better education wellbeing and emocional support vulnerable children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Colombia
Governance
- 11 February 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jorge Castano Mosquera | Chair | 24 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Ariel Rojas | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Mu Ocampo | Trustee | 24 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Rios Rojas | Trustee | 24 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £6.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.60k | £6.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 December 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED ON 14 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS WILL BE SUPPORTED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE ORPHANAGE IN PEREIRA (GEDEONES): 1. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; 2. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; AND 4. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 CLOCK TOWER MEWS
LONDON
SE28 8FA
- Phone:
- 07856568983
- Email:
- info@childactiongroup.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window