SPONSOR A SIBLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sponsor a sibling offers relief to siblings of children with life limiting or life threatening conditions and also bereaved siblings. We offer gift packs, bereavement packs, hospital entertainment packs and sibling awards to nominated siblings. Sponsor a sibling also has a 'Siblings caravan of love' to be used by siblings and their families for much needed free of charge holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 January 2018: CIO registration
- 18 April 2019: Funds received from 1176130 SPONSOR A SIBLING
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURA ROLPH-WILLS | Chair | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ROLPH-WILLS | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE PIERCE | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.55k | £39.18k | £19.08k | £7.72k | £498 | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.41k | £16.56k | £17.75k | £11.69k | £11.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 04 April 2025 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | 04 April 2025 | 278 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 04 April 2025 | 644 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | 04 April 2025 | 644 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SIBLINGS OF CHILDREN WITH LIFE LIMITED OR LIFE THREATENING CONDITIONS AND ALSO BEREAVED SIBLINGS THROUGHOUT ENGLAND, IRELAND, SCOTLAND AND WALES BY PROVIDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY A GIFT WHICH WILL BOOST MORALE AND OFFER SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGEMENT AND KEEPSAKES AND HOLIDAYS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 GRAFTON ROAD
HARWICH
CO12 3BD
- Phone:
- 07443418573
- Email:
- laura@sponsorasibling.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window