LANCASHIRE BADGER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF BADGERS IN THEIR NATURAL HABITATS; TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE BADGER AND THEIR SETTS FROM PERSECUTION AND CRIMINAL ACTIVITIES AND TO INCREASE AWARENESS OF THE NATURAL HISTORY AND ISSUES FACED BY BADGERS TO THE MUTUAL BENEFIT OF BADGERS AND THE PUBLIC. OPERATING PREDOMINATELY WITHIN LANCASHIRE BUT CAMPAIGNING NATIONWIDE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Wigan
Governance
- 04 January 2019: CIO registration
- 10 August 2022: Funds received from 1010893 LANCASHIRE BADGER GROUP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Justine Ann Mason | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Stevens | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Merryl Macdonald | Trustee | 08 November 2020 |
|
|||||
DAVID BEATTIE | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Ian Richard Scott | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Shoreman | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Hardman | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Anthony Coburn | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Geoffrey Mather | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.38k | £3.85k | £4.01k | £5.52k | £12.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.75k | £3.53k | £4.50k | £13.30k | £8.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 February 2024 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2024 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
1)TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF BADGERS IN THEIR NATURAL HABITATS AND TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE BADGER AND THEIR SETTS FROM PERSECUTION AND CRIMINAL ACTIVITIES; AND 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NATURAL HISTORY AND ISSUES FACED BY BADGERS TO THE MUTUAL BENEFIT OF BADGERS AND THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
461 Newchurch Road
Rossendale
BB4 7TG
- Phone:
- 08448707908
- Website:
-
lancashirebadgergroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window