EMPIRE THEATRE TRUST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Empire Theatre is a not for profit community project providing live shows, live music, comedy and entertainment for the town of Halstead and surrounding areas, also provides space for groups and organisations to use for performing arts classes and performances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £5,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 28 June 2018: CIO registration
- 06 January 2021: Funds received from 275693 HALSTEAD EMPIRE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Robert McCubbine Mr | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Karen Pearce | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Kemp | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andy Munday | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
NEIL KEITH HARDY | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.90k | £83.32k | £41.72k | £91.50k | £109.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.26k | £88.35k | £54.31k | £102.76k | £142.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.50k | £28.29k | £1.60k | £5.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 August 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 August 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 September 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 September 2022 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 October 2020 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 21 October 2020 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A THEATRE AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE HALSTEAD AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PARTICULARLY TO EDUCATE THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE ARTS & SCIENCES OF THE FILM AND THEATRE AND INCLUDING THE ARTS AND DRAMA, MIME, DANCING, SINGING AND MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PERFORMANCES AT THE THEATRE, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EMPIRE CINEMA
BUTLER ROAD
HALSTEAD
CO9 1LL
- Phone:
- 07778025490
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window