Financial history VIABLES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1177363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £119.46k £137.61k £128.19k £178.53k £160.23k
Total expenditure £133.62k £95.80k £106.16k £166.16k £179.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.95k £53.47k £24.00k £2.08k £15.51k