Financial history The Survivor Project t/a Salford Survivor Project

Charity Number: 1179115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/07/2020 08/07/2021 08/07/2022 08/07/2023 08/07/2024
Total gross income £37.23k £78.71k £75.63k £97.13k £111.74k
Total expenditure £24.58k £65.27k £61.83k £80.70k £106.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A