Accounts and annual returns CHESHIRE GHOST RIDERS

Charity number: 1178066
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 February 2025 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 May 2023 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2022 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2022 354 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required