THE CHURCH OF ST ANDREW, SHELSLEY WALSH, MAINTENANCE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain the fabric of the Church of St Andrew, Shelsley Walsh, Worcestershire and its surrounding churchyard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 05 August 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR ANTHONY EDWARD WINNINGTON | Chair |
|
||||||
WILLIAM SIMON DURLING | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elizabeth Sutherland | Trustee | 27 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALICE MARY TIMMIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN SEDELEY ELVINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.70k | £5.54k | £5.67k | £6.28k | £6.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.49k | £5.80k | £3.98k | £5.53k | £6.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 11 JUNE 1981 AS AMENDED BY 25 MAY 1993, AS AMENDED 19TH MAY 2003,
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN REPAIR AND SUPPORT THE UPKEEP OF THE FABRIC GOODS AND ORNAMENTS OF THE CHURCH OF ST. ANDREW SHELSLEY WALSH AND THE CHURCHYARD THEREOF. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
CHURCH (AND CHURCHYARD) OF ST. ANDREW, SHELSLEY WALSH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Lodge
Shelsley Beauchamp
Worcester
WR6 6RE
- Phone:
- 01886 812 560
- Email:
- robertjpound@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window