THE TUDOR PLAYERS

Charity Number: 511692

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are an amateur drama group who regularly produce 3 full length plays and a one-act play each year. We are currently self funding. We aim to provide the performing arts for the local community whilst allowing all individuals to develop their own talents.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £28,825
Total expenditure: £23,984

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 July 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Gascoyne Chair 17 January 2014
None on record
Peter Crown Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
HANSEL D'ROZA Trustee 17 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £19.95k £4.83k £12.43k £22.08k £28.83k
Total expenditure £20.26k £11.08k £15.06k £22.24k £23.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 January 2025 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Treetops
Snape Hill Lane
DRONFIELD
Derbyshire
S18 2GL
Phone:
01142853450