THE VICTORY ROOM, BUCKLEBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide (including the replacement, refurbishment and extension thereof) and maintain a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of Bucklebury cum Marlston and surrounding parishes without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation, with the object of improving the life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 07 March 2018: CIO registration
- 12 April 2021: Funds received from 1059459 THE VICTORY ROOM
- THE VICTORY ROOM (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Brims FCCA | Chair | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Rawdon Bywater | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Evan Bucknell | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|||||
David Glenn Parsons | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Stella Platt | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Wynne Frankum | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHIL LAYBOURNE | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE CLARE BRIMS FCCA | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BEVERLEY CLARKE | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
LINDY CLARKE | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIM JOHN CULLEY | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.79k | £35.37k | £217.59k | £81.53k | £23.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.75k | £11.10k | £235.04k | £100.73k | £25.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.24k | £15.05k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE (INCLUDING THE REPLACEMENT, REFURBISHMENT AND EXTENSION THEREOF) AND MAINTAIN A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BUCKLEBURY CUM MARLSTON AND SURROUNDING PARISHES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOUR SEASONS
HILLFOOT
CHAPEL ROW
READING
RG7 6PG
- Phone:
- 07799348451
- Email:
- jbrims@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window