Financial history BLOOMSBURY FOOTBALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £345.32k £624.78k £1.38m £2.37m £3.18m
Total expenditure £306.14k £587.01k £1.30m £2.13m £2.84m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £144.65k
Income from government grants N/A £95.53k £15.02k £139.55k £144.65k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £226.56k £768.79k £1.53m £2.35m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £3.77k £7.96k £3.75k £5.23k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £394.46k £605.91k £834.35k £823.33k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £2.93k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £587.01k £1.22m £1.99m £2.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £72.50k £142.22k £322.43k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.30k £7.80k £13.50k £15.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0