LISA SMART HUNTINGTON'S SUPPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIELLE SMART | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAUL HETHERINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CIARA TUOHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SOPHIA MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE SMART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SOPHIE SMART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PEOPLE WITH HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE AND WHERE PRACTICAL HELP AND SUPPORT CAN BE FOUND. (2) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL HELP, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND RESPITE CARE FOR PEOPLE WITH HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS. (3) MAKING GRANTS TO PAY FOR PERSONAL CARE, EQUIPMENT AND HOME ADAPTATIONS FOR PEOPLE WITH HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE. (4) MAKING GRANTS TO FUND RESEARCH INTO HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE AND THE TREATMENT OF THE DISEASE, PROVIDED THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 MANSTON DRIVE
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
CM23 5EN
- Phone:
- 07792052865
- Email:
- lisasmarthst@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window