Financial history EVERYONE PROSPER (SDB)

Charity Number: 1177009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £11.95k £23.59k £87.19k £91.21k £36.10k
Total expenditure £8.54k £20.22k £48.55k £103.72k £42.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.75k £67.50k £75.42k £31.00k