HMS Excellent Royal Naval Volunteer Cadet Corps

Charity Number: 1177892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE OBJECT OF THE RNVCC IS TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 9 AND 18 YEARS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SOCIAL CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS ADULTS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £9,113
Total expenditure: £9,299

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Portsmouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HMS EXCELLENT RNVCC (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Conway Chair 10 June 2022
None on record
Lorenzo Heitmeyer Trustee 25 April 2025
None on record
Joanna Goodship Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.90k £1.13k £3.91k £19.16k £9.11k
Total expenditure £13.73k £3.20k £6.51k £20.07k £9.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.82k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 April 2025 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
H M S Excellent
Whale Island
Portsmouth
PO2 8ER
Phone:
02392 547495