COPS (COMMUNITY OUTREACH PROJECT SOLUTIONS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COPS is a community action charity. FIREFIGHTERS supports people in crisis in the community via telephone support, feeds the homeless, befriends isolated and elderly people and supports disenfranchised people in need. THE NAKED TRUTH helps churches support trauma and abuse victims. BLACK AND BLUE works to build relations between the local authority police and black community and promote equality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
76 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 June 2018: CIO registration
- BLACK AND BLUE PROJECT (Working name)
- FIREFIGHTERS (Working name)
- Firefighters Social outreach Charity (Working name)
- THE NAKED TRUTH (Working name)
- B LACK AND BLUE PROJECT (Previous name)
- BAME and BLUE Project (Previous name)
- FIREFIGHTERS CHRISTIAN MINISTRY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
S VOUSDEN | Chair | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Straugh | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
R BOJANG | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71k | £10.75k | £6.25k | £12.20k | £11.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.54k | £10.39k | £5.97k | £12.15k | £7.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 13 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | 13 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jun 2018 as amended on 03 Jul 2020 as amended on 26 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN READING BERKSHIRE AND THE UNITED KINGDOM THAT ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 3. TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE IN READING BERKSHIRE AND THE UNITED KINGDOM AND TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME IN THE AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY OUTREACH PROJECT SOLUTION
40 Caversham Road
READING
RG1 7EB
- Phone:
- 0118 4492509
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window