TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (IPSWICH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are: 1. Encouraging members and others to live ethical lives in accordance with the teachings of the Buddha. 2. Supporting ordained members of the Triratna Buddhist Order. 3. Working under the guidance of the Triratna Buddhist Order. 4. Using applications of the Buddha's teaching to promote the health and well being of all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 October 2018: CIO registration
- 05 September 2022: Funds received from 1023335 TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (IPSWICH)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KELVIN YOUNGS | Chair | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diana Stone | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Joy Dowdle Haste | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Milkovics | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin Orme | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mosaic Clare Craigie-Williams | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Irene Dutch | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Guy Green | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JNANAMITRA EMMETT | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SPENCER COOK | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLARE ANNE RODGER | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Darren Barrenger | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.76k | £37.85k | £44.59k | £47.28k | £47.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £360 | £17.07k | £43.77k | £34.44k | £33.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.57k | £402 | £402 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 March 2023 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Buddhist Centre
4 Friars Bridge Road
IPSWICH
IP1 1RR
- Phone:
- 01473 211516
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window