INTERNATIONAL POSITIVE EDUCATION NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The International Positive Education Network (IPEN) brings together people and organisations in education committed to promoting the development of children's' and young peoples' character and well-being alongside their personal and academic achievements in order for them the flourish. Our growing network has three purposes: reform policy, change educational practices and support collaboration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Andorra
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Estonia
- Faroe Islands
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Hungary
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Jersey
- Kosovo
- Latvia
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malta
- Melilla
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Montenegro
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- San Marino
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Ukraine
- Vatican City
Governance
- 28 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Buchanan | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK ANTHONY CRUMP HANSON | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sir ANTHONY SELDON | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.91k | £5.26k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.04k | £3.17k | £1.50k | £0 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY BRINGING TOGETHER TEACHERS, PARENTS, ACADEMICS, STUDENTS, SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, UNIVERSITIES, CHARITIES, COMPANIES AND GOVERNMENTS TO PROMOTE POSITIVE EDUCATION. POSITIVE EDUCATION MEANS THE FULFILMENT OF STUDENTS’ INTELLECTUAL POTENTIAL THROUGH ACADEMIC STUDY ALONGSIDE THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR CHARACTER STRENGTHS AND WELL-BEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dadson Farm
Bethersden
ASHFORD
Kent
TN26 3EH
- Phone:
- 07941093102
- Email:
- PosEdNet@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window