Trustees HEADS OF EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT GROUP
Charity Number: 1181610

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bobbi Moore | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wolfenden | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Gordon | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jenny Lawrence | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Alan Chin | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Alice McIntosh | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Letizia Gramaglia | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Eve | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Maria Janeira Lucas | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.