BURY EDUCATION SUPPORT & TRAINING TRUST (BEST TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To advance the education of the governors and members of the public in the primary and secondary curriculum subjects and running of educational establishments. 2. To advance the education of the pupils at Greater Manchester schools by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education at such schools. 3. To provide continuous professional development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 May 2018: CIO registration
- BEST Trust (Working name)
- BEST TRUST (BURY EDUCATION SUPPORT & TRAINING TRUST ) (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Les Horton | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Thornton | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Norman Duffin | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CHADWICK | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN PERRY | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.99k | £230.70k | £192.28k | £175.14k | £148.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £306.77k | £220.10k | £274.75k | £189.45k | £170.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 206 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 May 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GOVERNORS AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRIMARY AND SECONDARY CURRICULUM SUBJECTS AND RUNNING OF EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT GREATER MANCHESTER SCHOOLS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT SUCH SCHOOLS. 3. TO PROVIDE CONTINUOUS PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT FOR EDUCATORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes C Of E Primary School
Morley Street
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 9JQ
- Phone:
- 07498 959 134
- Email:
- office@besttrust.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window