DEVIZES ASSIZE COURT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PRESERVE PROPERTY AND BUILDINGS OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST OR IMPORTANCE, IN PARTICULAR IN THE AREA OF WILTSHIRE; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HISTORY, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 06 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Charles Troughton | Chair | 06 December 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Caroline Margaret Kay | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Martin Andrew Clarke | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Stuart John Kennedy Wheeler | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Lucy Ann Maxwell Scot | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Laura Elizabeth McNicholas | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
David Bedingfeld Scott | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Martin John Nye | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Nicholas Blethyn Elliott | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|||||||||
LAURA EVELYN MAYES | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT HENRY HUNT-GRUBBE | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.62k | £39.73k | £49.80k | £72.81k | £66.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.58k | £104.44k | £36.49k | £57.20k | £93.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO PRESERVE PROPERTY AND BUILDINGS OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST OR IMPORTANCE, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) IN THE AREA OF WILTSHIRE; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HISTORY, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM; AND TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greenwood Williams Ltd
Syms Building
Bumpers Way
Bumpers Farm
CHIPPENHAM
SN14 6LH
- Phone:
- 01249 448373
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window