SOUTH TYNESIDE PRISON MATTERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to rehabilitate ex-offenders by supporting men and women released from prison, to return to life in the community by: (1) Providing personal support, encouragement, friendship (2) Providing therapeutic sessions, offered by professionals and assisted by volunteers. (3). Encouraging volunteering and seeking opportunities to get involved (4) Providing opportunities for beneficiaries to learn
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 12 September 2018: CIO registration
- 02 September 2021: Removed (Removed by application)
- 02 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1153612 CHURCHES TOGETHER IN SOUTH TYNESIDE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 23/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.06k | £7.42k | £11.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.85k | £5.76k | £9.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 April 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 April 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 06 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2019
(These accounts |
06 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF EX-OFFENDERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SUPPORTING THOSE RELEASED FROM THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEM IN RETURNING TO LIFE IN THE NON-PRISON COMMUNITY BY: - WORKING TO EQUIP THOSE WHO ACCESS ITS SERVICES WITH 'LIFE SKILLS'; - PROVIDING PERSONAL SUPPORT, ENCOURAGEMENT, FRIENDSHIP AND THERAPEUTIC SESSIONS, OFFERED BY PROFESSIONALS AND ASSISTED BY VOLUNTEERS; - PROMOTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PROJECT USERS TO ENGAGE IN VOLUNTEERING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window