JONATHAN'S VOICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
INCREASING THE UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF SUICIDE RISK, PARTICULARLY IN YOUNG PROFESSIONAL PEOPLE WITH A VIEW TO REDUCING STIGMA AND EMPOWERING INDIVIDUALS TO SPEAK ABOUT MENTAL HEALTH BY EDUCATING COMPANIES AND INDIVIDUALS THROUGH THE ORGANISATION OF WORKSHOPS AND USE OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION MATERIAL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 October 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Edward McCartney BMBCH, MA | Chair | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keven Bader | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Meller | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Cox | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID GRAHAM MCCARTNEY MA DPHIL | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE JUNE MCCARTNEY B.Ed M.A | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR LESLEY MCCARTNEY BA | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.02k | £15.15k | £37.79k | £96.82k | £49.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.07k | £15.61k | £28.15k | £46.01k | £46.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE HEALTH BY: 1. INCREASING THE UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF SUICIDE RISK, PARTICULARLY IN YOUNG PROFESSIONAL PEOPLE WITH A VIEW TO REDUCING STIGMA AND EMPOWERING INDIVIDUALS TO SPEAK ABOUT MENTAL HEALTH BY EDUCATING COMPANIES AND INDIVIDUALS THROUGH THE ORGANISATION OF WORKSHOPS AND USE OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION MATERIALS 2. EDUCATING ORGANISATIONS, PARTICULARLY IN THE PROFESSIONAL ENVIRONMENT, FOR THE PURPOSE OF ENCOURAGING THEM TO CREATE THE RIGHT SUPPORT STRUCTURES, POLICIES AND PRACTICE TO SUPPORT EMPLOYEES WITH MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING BY PROVIDING WORKSHOPS WHICH INFORM THEM OF THE RISK OF SUICIDE AND OF THE NEED FOR SUCH MENTAL HEALTH INITIATIVES
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Ramsay Road
Headington
OXFORD
OX3 8AY
- Phone:
- 07887548134
- Email:
- info@jonathansvoice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window