Financial history REACH BWINDI

Charity number: 1177950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/04/2020 09/04/2021 09/04/2022 09/04/2023 09/04/2024
Total gross income £76.96k £66.61k £17.33k £12.07k £23.95k
Total expenditure £69.36k £52.27k £31.32k £10.00k £26.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A