DEVON AND CORNWALL PEELERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity receives applications from Police officers or members of Police staff in Devon and Cornwall, requesting an item/voucher etc. to be donated to a victim, witness or another person adversely affected by crime. The charity decides what to purchase, if anything, and this is sent to the officer/member of staff to deliver in person, acting as a morale boost for all involved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 19 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANICE ANN ADAM | Chair | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Thomas Colwell | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Netherton OBE | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kylie Joyce | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr REBECCA HOLLY MITCHELL | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDY BERRY | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.86k | £22 | £27 | £163 | £1.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.04k | £1.50k | £1.03k | £1.22k | £1.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 February 2025 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 February 2025 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Sep 2018 as amended on 14 Jun 2022 as amended on 24 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: The relief of need, hardship or distress of victims, witnesses and other persons adversely affected by actions or behaviour which the police are required to investigate and do investigate in the Devon and Cornwall area.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Devon & Cornwall Constabulary
Police Federation
Unit 2
River Court
Pynes Hill
EXETER
- Phone:
- 01392354770
- Email:
- fedoffice@devon.polfed.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window