GLOSSOP NORTH END COMMUNITY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sport - mainly Association Football
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Derbyshire
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Stockport
- Tameside
Governance
- 20 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER CLEGG | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE MILLS | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JON MATTHEWS | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW HOLBROOK | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
BEN MILLS | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.33k | £170.23k | £171.49k | £140.18k | £147.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.66k | £83.22k | £132.89k | £135.75k | £148.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.85k | £10.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jun 2018 as amended on 18 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING FOOTBALL ACTIVITIES).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glossop Community Sports Hub
Cemetery Road
GLOSSOP
Derbyshire
SK13 7QG
- Phone:
- 07971117194
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window