Financial history BISHOP WILTON SHOW

Charity number: 1178613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £5.37k £3.73k £21.88k £104.10k £34.40k
Total expenditure £834 £3.23k £26.89k £33.99k £29.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A