LIVERPOOL CITY CENTRE STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1177496
Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Liverpool Street Pastors are highly trained volunteers from local churches who care about their community. We patrol the nighttime economy providing practical assistance to vulnerable people at the point of need. In teams of men and women of at least four to care, listen and help people who are out on the streets during the night time economy between 10:30pm and 4:00am.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £2,957
Total expenditure: £3,152

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Liverpool City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gareth James Lloyd Morgan Chair 18 May 2019
WOOLTON BOYS' CLUB
Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days
Mark Latham Trustee 12 March 2018
WIRRAL STREET PASTORS
Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Rev PHILIP HAROLD JANVIER Trustee 12 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.43k £6.43k £2.96k
Total expenditure £9.11k £5.84k £3.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 March 2023 401 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 March 2023 401 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2022 415 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 March 2022 415 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. STEPHENS RECTORY
BELLE VALE ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L25 2PQ
Phone:
07729001331