GO GIRLS

Charity number: 1179108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

GO Girls is a UK charity supporting all women with gynaecological cancers and raising funds to create greater awareness of all 5 gynaecological cancers

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £13,030
Total expenditure: £17,626

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 July 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HILARY MAXWELL Chair 01 July 2018
None on record
Peter Hardy Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Becky Lewis Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Jessica Mills Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Sharon Joanne McCartney Trustee 06 February 2020
None on record
Siobhan Griffiths Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
ALASTAIR MAXWELL Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.18k £23.58k £10.88k £12.34k £13.03k
Total expenditure £6.70k £14.83k £9.15k £14.06k £17.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
44 THE RIDGEWAY
UPWEY
WEYMOUTH
DT3 5QQ
Phone:
07780467061