Financial history MESSENGER OF SAINT ANTHONY UK

Charity Number: 1180228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £479.98k £532.80k £428.81k £465.70k £904.49k
Total expenditure £144.50k £397.29k £396.45k £393.14k £469.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £532.80k N/A N/A £904.49k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £435.80k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £397.29k N/A N/A £469.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £121.32k N/A N/A £119.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £170.00k N/A N/A £287.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0