HEALD FAMILY TRUST

Charity Number: 1177327
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

relief of poverty and deprivation improvement of education protection of environment river defence work

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Guy Hilliard Heald Chair 10 April 2018
THE ALDE & ORE ESTUARY TRUST
Received: On time
THE ST MARY ABBOTS SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
EMMA MAY ALEXANDRA GOODMAN Trustee 10 April 2018
None on record
LUCINDA JANE FULLERTON HEALD Trustee 10 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £4.13k £8.25k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 27 August 2024 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 27 August 2024 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 24 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 30 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 20 August 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 20 August 2021 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 February 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 February 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 Farmer Street
London
W8 7SN
Phone:
02032200107
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available