Financial history SUVAI DEAF EAST COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1180055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.79k £60.38k £79.55k £100.02k £90.54k
Total expenditure £26.76k £33.13k £54.38k £77.06k £69.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £100.02k N/A