THE ARCHIE CRUICKSHANK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote humane behaviour towards animals by preventing and relieving suffering of abandoned and mistreated animals. To advance in life and relieve the needs of young people who are in need by reason of ill-health, addiction or other social and economic disadvantage by providing opportunities to be exposed to, and work on behalf of, animals in an animal-caring environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 21 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Cruickshank MBE, MA | Chair | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHOEBE CRUICKSHANK | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
HENRY CRUICKSHANK | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON BELL | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR JAMES HARROP-GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.55k | £1.15k | £5.96k | £1.12k | £465 | |
|
Total expenditure | £216 | £162 | £126 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2024 | 348 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2024 | 348 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 358 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 358 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING AND RELIEVING SUFFERING OF ABANDONED AND MISTREATED ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE WORK OF ANIMAL WELFARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE. (B) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, ADDICTION OR OTHER SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO BE EXPOSED TO, AND WORK ON BEHALF OF, ANIMALS IN AN ANIMAL-CARING ENVIRONMENT IN ORDER TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 THE PARADE
MONMOUTH
NP25 3PA
- Phone:
- 07729121216
- Email:
- paulc@agfcfoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window