Accounts and annual returns ROYAL AIR FORCE EQUITATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1182739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late Download Open in new window