THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR ASIAN AFFAIRS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The RSAA runs lectures, promotes study, publishes the journal Asian Affairs and maintains a library and archive devoted to all of the countries of Asia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 July 2018: CIO registration
- 28 January 2019: Funds received from 212152 THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR ASIAN AFFAIRS
- RSAA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Ibbotson | Chair | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deepa Ramchandani | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sandeep Kaur Sandhu | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ranbir Jhutty | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve King | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Mary Spink | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Kerry Brown | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew Ross McKee | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Kate Thorp | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hayes | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Dorey | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Skipper | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £937.88k | £151.66k | £143.89k | £171.35k | £181.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.03k | £159.18k | £170.79k | £165.67k | £201.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £827.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £80.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £29.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £198.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE LEARNING AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF AND WITH REGARD TO ALL THE COUNTRIES OF ASIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HUDSON HOUSE
8 TAVISTOCK STREET
LONDON
WC2E 7PP
- Phone:
- 02072355122
- Email:
- info@rsaa.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window