Trustees THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR ASIAN AFFAIRS
Charity Number: 1179300

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Ibbotson | Chair | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deepa Ramchandani | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sandeep Kaur Sandhu | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ranbir Jhutty | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve King | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Mary Spink | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Kerry Brown | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew Ross McKee | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Kate Thorp | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hayes | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Dorey | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Skipper | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.