Trustees FRIENDS OF QUEEN'S PARK CRICKET

Charity number: 1177204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NEIL SWANWICK Chair 18 February 2018
None on record
Ian McNeilly Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Jill Mannion-Brunt Trustee 05 June 2023
None on record
Jonathan Owen Harris Trustee 12 October 2022
None on record
Paul Michael Hand Trustee 29 January 2020
None on record
Stephen Brunt Trustee 29 January 2020
NORTH DERBYSHIRE MINERS' WELFARE TRUST FUND SCHEME
Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
PETER KENNAN Trustee 19 February 2018
HELSTON RAILWAY PRESERVATION SOCIETY
Received: On time
MR CHRIS RADFORD Trustee 18 February 2018
None on record