LEWES PASSION PLAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lewes Passion Play tells the story of Easter to the local community. The Gospel account is brought to life on the streets of the town. Performances are throughout Holy Week. Lewes Passion Play is a focus group which aims to extend Christian unity through artistic and social activities, culminating in a passion play every 5 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 28 March 2018: CIO registration
- Lewes Christian Arts (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SERENA JOY SMITH | Chair | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Stanley LLB Hons | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christina Pepper | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Josie Alwyn | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|||||
ROBERT PARR | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Lorna Melia | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Rachael Nicholson | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
PETER GEORGE SHEARS | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM JOHN PURDYE | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.29k | £725 | £595 | £378 | £150 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.51k | £1.03k | £679 | £752 | £642 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN LEWES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, PARTICIPATING IN DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL PERFORMANCES, BROADCASTING, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Silverburn
Gote Lane
Ringmer
LEWES
East Sussex
BN8 5HP
- Phone:
- 07905419868
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window