Accounts and annual returns HOLDERNESS HEDGEHOG HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1178929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 April 2024 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 April 2024 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 October 2023 266 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window