NEW NEIGHBOURS TOGETHER CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer radical hospitality to all sanctuary seekers in Burnley, a warm welcome and inclusion in our community, including safe social cafe space, wellbeing activities, sharing quality donated goods, conversational ESOL, an Advice& Advocacy service, a positive move on service for people transitioning to refugee status and encouraging our clients input and ownership of our charity at all levels.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £57,800 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 05 September 2018: CIO registration
- NEW NEIGHBOURS TOGETHER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Elizabeth Sidhu | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Maureen Butler | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Huriyah Hussain | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Heather Ryan | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Hewitt | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Middleton | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.74k | £11.57k | £26.43k | £82.00k | £146.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.97k | £10.84k | £22.70k | £73.82k | £125.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £25.71k | £57.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY PROVIDING : 1) EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL SKILLS. 2) SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. TO RELIEVE POVERTY (OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP) AMONG ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING IN BURNLEY AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS BY PROVIDING:INTERPRETING, TRANSLATING, ADVOCACY, HEALTH, HOUSING ADVICE AND EDUCATION. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Neighbours Together CIO
Northbridge House
Elm St
Burnley
BB10 1PD
- Phone:
- 07864841729
- Website:
-
nntburnley.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window